THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:02:03 AM
Crowe, Anne Rosemary
CPSO#:
32280
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
385 Frederick St # 16
Kitchener ON N2H 2P2
Phone: 519-745-7482
Fax: 855-658-1456
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY CROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2018 |