skip to content

Croke, Jennifer Michelle

CPSO#: 88676

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
7-202-700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2320
Fax: (416) 946-2111 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Croke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE CROKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015