THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:27:56 AM
Croke, Jennifer Michelle
CPSO#:
88676
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-700 University Ave
7-525-700 University Ave
Radiation Medicine Program UHN - Pr
7-525
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416-946-2320
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE CROKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2015 |