Corbo, Michael Domenic (CPSO#: 97549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1065 Canadian Place
Unit 303
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: 9056255600
Fax: 9056255650
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge Street
Unit 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: (905) 773-3515
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Corbo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Corbo ( CPSO# 97549 )

Business Address:
Level 2
Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z9
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
303-1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 625-5600

Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMENIC CORBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017