THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:25:54 AM
Corbo, Michael Domenic
CPSO#:
97549
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
13291 Yonge Street
Unit 401
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: (905) 773-3515
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMENIC CORBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |