First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 19 Nov 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2017 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2023 |