THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:13:40 PM
Cook, Sarah Elizabeth
CPSO#:
86719
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205-101 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON M5R 1C1
Phone: 416-962-1200
Fax: 416-962-1223
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 19 Nov 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2017 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2023 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Cook’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Cook engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including: between approximately 2016 and 2020, by writing prescriptions for herself in the name of other physicians; between approximately 2010 and 2020, in failing to maintain appropriate boundaries in her interactions with Patient A, whose identity has been disclosed under separate cover, including in person, through text messaging, and/or social media; and providing incomplete and/or inaccurate information to the College in the course of an investigation.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)