skip to content

Consky, Earl Sydney

CPSO#: 50286

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 603-7904
Fax: (416) 603-7929 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EARL SYDNEY CONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1987