THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:47:54 PM
Consky, Earl Sydney
CPSO#:
50286
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 603-7904
Fax: (416) 603-7929
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EARL SYDNEY CONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1987 |