skip to content

Cong, Quynh Huong

CPSO#: 87491

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 14163604000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:27 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QUYNH HUONG CONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 26 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 27 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Oct 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018