THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 23:26:19 PM
Cong, Quynh Huong
CPSO#:
87491
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 14163604000
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. QUYNH HUONG CONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 26 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Oct 2020
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2018 |