skip to content

Collinson, Elizabeth Grierson

CPSO#: 22339

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 187 Queenston Street St. Catharines, Ontario L2R 3A3 Tel: (905) 688-5125 Fax: (905) 688-9648
Date Received: 21 Nov 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 2012