THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:39:54 PM
Collinson, Elizabeth Grierson
CPSO#:
22339
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
187 Queenston Street
St. Catharines, Ontario
L2R 3A3
Tel: (905) 688-5125
Fax: (905) 688-9648
Date Received: 21 Nov 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1969 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Mar 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2012 |