skip to content

Collins, Stephen Michael

CPSO#: 32336

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Farncombe Institute (Room 3N4)
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73884
Fax: (905) 523-6048 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1981