THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:01:27 PM
Collins, Stephen Michael
CPSO#:
32336
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 May 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Farncombe Institute (Room 3N4)
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73884
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1981 |