skip to content

Cole, Donald Charles

CPSO#: 31128

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Dec 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Grey CHC
55 Victoria Ave
PO Box 360
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone: 519 986 2222
Fax: 519 986 3999 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chesley Medical Clinic
33 Second Street
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Canada
Phone: 519 363 3119
Fax: 519 363 0385
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

OHCOW
970 Lawrence Ave. West, Suite 110
Toronto ON  M6A 3B6
Canada
Phone: 1-877-817-0336
Fax: 416-449-7772
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective:20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective:01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD CHARLES COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Aug 1978 to 07 Aug 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986