THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:54:46 PM
Cole, Donald Charles
CPSO#:
31128
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Dec 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Dec 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12-64 Absalom St E
Mildmay Community Medical Clinic
Brockton & Area Family Health
Mildmay ON N0G 2J0
Phone: 226-909-3470
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Community Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD CHARLES COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 1978 to 07 Aug 1979
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Apr 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1986 |