skip to content

Colapinto, David Andrew

CPSO#: 85819

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kigezi International School of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty St
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Colapinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Colapinto ( CPSO# 85819 )

Business Address:
48 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW COLAPINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLAPINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009