THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:38:03 AM
Colapinto, David Andrew
CPSO#:
85819
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kigezi International School of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW COLAPINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLAPINTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |