skip to content

Clark, James Montague

CPSO#: 18945

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CPM Unit 6 2125 Wyecroft Road Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Date Received: 22 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 2015