THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:13:58 PM
Clark, James Montague
CPSO#:
18945
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Nov 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:CPM
Unit 6
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Date Received: 22 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:13 Nov 1963 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jan 2015 |