skip to content

Citynski, Hollie Leigh Ann

CPSO#: 86332

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry (Reproduct
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6400
Fax: 416-323-6356 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher J Coutinho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coutinho ( CPSO# 80766 )
Dr. H. Citynski ( CPSO# 86332 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
4 - 490 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 898-2519

Business Address:
200 - 222 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5

Business Address:
201 - 235 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Phone Number: (905) 853-3727

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:11 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOLLIE LEIGH ANN CITYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CITYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2011 to 20 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2012 to 10 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016