THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:57:50 AM
Citynski, Hollie Leigh Ann
CPSO#:
86332
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry (Reproduct
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6400
Fax: 416-323-6356
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOLLIE LEIGH ANN CITYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CITYNSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2011 to 20 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2012 to 10 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2016 |