skip to content

Shoemaker, Christopher Alan

CPSO#: 28832

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 05 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2023

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Christopher Alan Shoemaker’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Shoemaker engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his communications, including but not limited to communications on social media / online / digital platforms regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. This includes but is not limited to making misleading, false or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19.
 
It is also alleged that Dr. Shoemaker engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and is ungovernable, in light of the conduct described in paragraph 1 above and his public communications regarding the College and its regulatory functions.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Merits; June 27, 2024