THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:29:37 PM
Shoemaker, Christopher Alan
CPSO#:
28832
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
05 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 May 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2023 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Christopher Alan Shoemaker’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Shoemaker engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his communications, including but not limited to communications on social media / online / digital platforms regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. This includes but is not limited to making misleading, false or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19.
It is also alleged that Dr. Shoemaker engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and is ungovernable, in light of the conduct described in paragraph 1 above and his public communications regarding the College and its regulatory functions.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)