skip to content

Chouinard, Erin Leanne Dawn

CPSO#: 95474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Graham, Erin Leanne Dawn (used until: 09 Sep 2012 )     Michel, Erin Leanne Dawn (used until: 09 Sep 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
402-5400 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone: 9053576636
Fax: 9053575592 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 9053784674 Ext. 43128
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin L. D. Chouinard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chouinard ( CPSO# 95474 )

Business Address:
402-5400 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone Number: 9053576636

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN LEANNE DAWN CHOUINARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUINARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013