THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:32:40 AM
Chouinard, Erin Leanne Dawn
CPSO#:
95474
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Graham, Erin Leanne Dawn (used until: 09 Sep 2012 )
Michel, Erin Leanne Dawn (used until: 09 Sep 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
402-5400 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Phone: 9053576636
Fax: 9053575592
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIN LEANNE DAWN CHOUINARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUINARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2013 |