skip to content

Chong Ping, Aldric Michael

CPSO#: 25253

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 May 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 May 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 2004