THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:25:58 PM
Chong Ping, Aldric Michael
CPSO#:
25253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 May 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 May 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Nov 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 May 2004 |