skip to content

Chiu, Ernest Honyu

CPSO#: 98160

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: July 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College:

(1) 2 counts of Sexual Interference with two persons under 16 years old between December 1, 2016 and April 30, 2017, at the City of Toronto, contrary to section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada;
(2) 2 counts of Invitation to Sexual Touching to two persons under 16 years old between December 1, 2016 and April 30, 2017, at the City of Toronto, contrary to Section 152 of the Criminal Code of Canada;
(3) 2 counts of Obtaining Sexual Services for Consideration from two persons under 18 years old between December 1, 2016 and April 30, 2017, at the City of Toronto, contrary to Section 286.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada;
(4) 2 counts of Sexual Assault against two persons between December 1, 2016 and April 30, 2017, at the City of Toronto, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada; and
(5) 1 count of Obtaining Sexual Services for Consideration, on or about January 30, 2018, at the City of Toronto, contrary to Section 286.1(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: October 6, 2017; December 21, 2017; June 20, 2018
Place of charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: July 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal.

The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:

[June 20, 2018]
1. Reside with surety at specified address.
2. Notify the Officer in Charge (or designate) at Human Trafficking Enforcement Team at number specified within 24 hours of any change in his name, address, occupation or employment.
3. Do not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person.
4. Do not be within 150 metres of any place where Chiu knows named person lives, works, attends school, frequent or any place you know named person to be.
5. Do not use any electronic device that have or can be made to have access to the INTERNET, including but not limited to cell phones, computers, tablets, Ipods, Iphones, except for educational purposes or while supervised by his surety.
6. Do not attend any commercial establishment that provides lodging or accommodation including any hotel, motel, Air BnB, Bed and Breakfast, Inn, Resort, except in the direct company of his surety.
7. Do not be in the company of any female patient, except in the company of another regulated health professional.
8. Do not be alone with any female under the age of 18.
9. Do not have any private contact or communication directly or indirectly with any female under the age of 18.