skip to content

Cheng, Sai Wah

CPSO#: 23938

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Cheng's medical records are being stored by: Elgin Imaging Services Inc. 230 First Avenue St. Thomas, ON N5R 4P5
Date Received: 11 May 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011