THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:27:57 AM
Cheng, Sai Wah
CPSO#:
23938
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Cheng's medical records are being stored by:
Elgin Imaging Services Inc.
230 First Avenue
St. Thomas, ON
N5R 4P5
Date Received: 11 May 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |