skip to content

Chaparro Gomez, Luis Enrique

CPSO#: 87342

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Mar 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Antioquia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Aug 2020 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:26 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2021 Active
 1. Dr. LUIS ENRIQUE CHAPARRO GOMEZ may practise anesthesiology with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Grand River Hospital in Kitchener, Ontario; and

(ii) St. Mary's General Hospital in Kitchener, Ontario. 

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2021, and will expire on or before 31 March, 2024, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.