THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:42:14 PM
Chaparro Gomez, Luis Enrique
CPSO#:
87342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Antioquia, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health centre
Anesthesiology
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 4168900424
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:28 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUIS ENRIQUE CHAPARRO GOMEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 20 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2021 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2021 |