skip to content

Chandran, Lavan

CPSO#: 85086

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harbourfront Appletree
Suite 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone: (416) 366-2273
Fax: (416) 366-5665 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Chandran & Gakhal Medicine Professional Corporporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chandran ( CPSO# 85086 )
Dr. N. Gakhal ( CPSO# 84308 )

Business Address:
Harbourfront Health & Wellness Court
Suite 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Room 1001
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6344

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Jun 2019 Active
             As from June 24, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lavan Chandran, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chandran to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") of
                                          DR. LAVAN CHANDRAN
                                          ("Dr. Chandran") to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chandran, certificate of registration number 85086, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that, following a public complaint that
                  raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, the
                  College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1102312 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or
                  am incompetent in my family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this
                  Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Chandran, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chandran, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review and written summary of the following College policies:
                              1.    Prescribing Drugs; and
                              2.    Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others
                                    Close to Them; and
                        (ii)  PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing
                              evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.
                              I, Dr. Chandran, will agree to abide by any recommendations
                              of the PROBE program.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chandran, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chandran, undertake to complete this requirement by November
                        1, 2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time,
                        by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chandran, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chandran, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chandran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Following a public complaint that raised concerns about his
                        standard of practice in family medicine, a College investigation
                        was conducted into whether Dr. Chandran engaged in professional
                        misconduct and/or is incompetent in prescribing, the practice of
                        family medicine. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Chandran will engage in professional education in
                              maintaining appropriate professional boundaries, and
                              prescribing.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chandran, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Chandran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice;
                         and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Chandran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Chandran, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:
                  
                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lavan Chandran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 24, 2019:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine, a College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chandran engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in prescribing, the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Chandran will engage in professional education in maintaining appropriate professional boundaries, and prescribing.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)