THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:03:34 AM
Chandran, Lavan
CPSO#:
85086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
900 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1A5
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAVAN CHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)