skip to content

Chan, Stephanie Chung Yan

CPSO#: 97585

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3P7
Phone: (819) 771-6015
Fax: 819-484-0168

Additional Practice Location(s)

10-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: 1(613) 288-202
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Chan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan ( CPSO# 97585 )

Business Address:
Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3P7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CHUNG YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018