THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:41:18 AM
Chan, Stephanie Chung Yan
CPSO#:
97585
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Ophtalmologique
de l'Outaouais
29 rue Ducharme
Gatineau QC J8Y 3P7
Phone: (819) 771-6015
Fax: 819-484-0168
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CHUNG YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |