skip to content

Cashin, Carolyn Ann

CPSO#: 86311

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Connors, Carolyn Ann (used until: 29 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 19 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018