THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:56:33 AM
Cashin, Carolyn Ann
CPSO#:
86311
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Connors, Carolyn Ann (used until: 29 Jun 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |