Carmona Garcia, Sergio Augusto (CPSO#: 101247)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2016