THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:38:32 PM
Carmona Garcia, Sergio Augusto
CPSO#:
101247
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2016 |