skip to content

Carleton, Susan Andrea

CPSO#: 25100

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
127 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y4
Phone: (519) 743-1451
Fax: (519) 743-8220 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
Phone: (705) 457-1212
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Carleton, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carleton ( CPSO# 25100 )

Business Address:
127 Park Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 743-1451

Business Address:
331A Broadway
Orangeville ON  L9W 1J7
Phone Number: (519) 938-9997

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Practice Centre
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN ANDREA CARLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLETON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 May 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1974