THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:24:12 AM
Carleton, Susan Andrea
CPSO#:
25100
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
127 Park Street
Waterloo ON N2L 1Y4
Phone: (519) 743-1451
Fax: (519) 743-8220
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Carleton, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:17 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN ANDREA CARLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLETON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 May 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1974 |