skip to content

Calvo Ballesteros, Maria Eugenia

CPSO#: 87427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2014