THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:20:32 PM
Calvo Ballesteros, Maria Eugenia
CPSO#:
87427
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 06 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |