skip to content

Tram, Carolyn Quyen Ngoc

CPSO#: 88870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Ave
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

265 Dundas St. East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carolyn Tram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tram ( CPSO# 88870 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Scarborough Hospital General Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN QUYEN NGOC TRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012