skip to content

Ribas, Carlos Sebastian

CPSO#: 78256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-385 Wilson St E
Ancaster Cardiology
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C1
Phone: 905-648-6883
Fax: 905-648-1288 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carlos Ribas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ribas ( CPSO# 78256 )

Business Address:
205-385 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2016 Active
             Dr. Carlos Sebastian Ribas may practise medicine independently in cardiology.