skip to content

Bacher, Corey Adam

CPSO#: 106716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St.
3 Shuter, Office 3-040 (3rd floor)
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-684-6060 Ext. 2083 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bacher ( CPSO# 33345 )
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 93621 )
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 95078 )
Dr. C. Bacher ( CPSO# 106716)

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
Wexford Nursing Home
1860 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 5B1
Phone Number: (416) 752-8877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Corey  Adam  Bacher  may  practise Neurology in Ontario, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires six months from the
                  date  of issuance or when Dr. Bacher's  eligibility  to  take  the  Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (I)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Bacher's knowledge, skill, judgment or professionalism, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Bacher's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is issued on July 1, 2020, and will expire on or before
                  December 31, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.