skip to content

Byron, Kevin Gerald

CPSO#: 86748

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chigamik Community Health Centre
287 Bayshore Drive
Midland ON  L4R 0H1
Phone: (705) 527-4154 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Georgian Bay
Community Health Centre
14 Ramblewood Drive, Unit 202
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Canada
Phone: 705-422-0900
Fax: 705-422-1078
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Byron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013
Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Byron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Byron ( CPSO# 86748 )

Business Address:
10-845 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 0B7
Phone Number: (705) 527-4154

Business Address:
South Georgian Bay Community Health Centre
Suite 202
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 422-0900

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Carlisle Medical Centre 1493 Centre Road Carlisle, Ontario L0R 1H0
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN GERALD BYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014